This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 20:16:02 (UTC).

RUSH VS ACKERMAN/ANZA MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 09/04/2015 RUSH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ACKERMAN/ANZA MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7065

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IVONNA RUSH

Defendants

MICHAEL ACKERMAN

ANZA MANAGEMENT

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR IMAGING OF CORRESPONDENC (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR IMAGING OF CORRESPONDENC (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED. REQUEST IS DENIED. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED. REQUEST IS DENIED. (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY IVONNA RUSH. (IMAGED)

REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY IVONNA RUSH. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ANZA MANAGEMENT FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ANZA MANAGEMENT FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:47; KYLE S BRODIE, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF IVONNA RUSH PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MICHAEL ACKERMAN; ANZA MANAGEMENT REPRESENTED BY VIOLETA GARCIA AND NOEMI LOMELI.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- IVONNA RUSH IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; VIOLETA GARCIA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; NOEMI LOMELI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 11:18; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/04/2015 OF IVONNA RUSH ORDERED ENTERED 10/22/15; JUDGMENT FOR: IVONNA RUSH; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANZA MANAGEMENT; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $425.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $425.00; COURT DOES NOT AWARD COSTS; NO NEGATIVE CREDIT REPORTING PURSUANT TO CC 1786.18(A)(4).; ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL ACKERMAN WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ANZA MANAGEMENT. PARTY SERVED ON 09/25/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ANZA MANAGEMENT. PARTY SERVED ON 09/25/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL ACKERMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 09/25/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL ACKERMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 09/25/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR IMAGING OF CORRESPONDENC (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF ORDER ON REQ TO CORRECT/CANCEL JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED. REQUEST IS DENIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • VACATE CLERK HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/30/15 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CCF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • CALENDAR THE CASE ON THE CLERK'S CALENDAR FOR 11/30/15 AT 08:00 FOR CLERK CCF; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL REQUEST TO CORRECT/CANCEL JUDGMENT/ANSWER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY IVONNA RUSH. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ANZA MANAGEMENT. PARTY SERVED ON 09/25/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL ACKERMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 09/25/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON IVONNA RUSH FOR FIRST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY IVONNA RUSH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY IVONNA RUSH IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.