This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 10:15:55 (UTC).

RUIZ VS GRANADOS

Case Summary

On 10/14/2010 RUIZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GRANADOS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0588

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNA RUIZ

Defendants

CAROLYNNE J. GRANADOS

MIKE A. GRANADOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT A KRASNEY

362 West 6Th Street

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1129

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN FOR P/U); Minutes; Receipt: 101028-0177 $25.00; 101028-0177-CK Reference Number 27548

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 10/14/2010 OF ANNA RUIZ ORDERED ENTERED 10/27/10; JUDGMENT FOR: ANNA RUIZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MIKE A. GRANADOS, CAROLYNNE J. GRANADOS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MIKE A. GRANADOS, CAROLYNNE J. GRANADOS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CAROLYNNE J. GRANADOS; PARTY SERVED ON 10/14/10 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MIKE A. GRANADOS; PARTY SERVED ON 10/14/10 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MIKE A. GRANADOS, CAROLYNNE J. GRANADOS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 10/14/2010 OF ANNA RUIZ AS TO MIKE A. GRANADOS, CAROLYNNE J. GRANADOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANNA RUIZ FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 101014-1946 $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.