This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 23:00:28 (UTC).

RUIZ -V- CRUZ

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 RUIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRUZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5792

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANICE RUIZ

Defendant

JOHN FRANK CRUZ JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORIEL L FLORES

21671 Gateway Center Drive Suite 103

Diamopnd Bar, CA 91765

Defendant Attorney

BEVINS & GLAUSER

560 E Hospitality Lane Suite 460

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON CMC AS TO DEF JOHN FRANK CRUZ JR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: LORI MOWLES; COURT REPORTER LAWANA VASQUEZ 12582; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ERIC ANDERSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT THAT MATTER HAS; SETTLED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL RE SETTLEMENT SET FOR 06/06/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY DEFENSE COUNSEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • FILE SENT TO S37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • COURT ORDERS MATTER STAYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JANICE RUIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANT HAS FILED AN ANSWER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY JOHN FRANK CRUZ JR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BEVINS & GLAUSER. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 111213-1836 $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOHN FRANK CRUZ JR SERVED ON 10/05/11 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 05/04/2011 OF JANICE RUIZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-0931 $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37

    Read MoreRead Less