This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/06/2018 at 20:09:08 (UTC).

RUIZ-V-AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 RUIZ-V-AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1377

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINDY RUIZ

Defendant

AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRITT SMITH LLP

2601 Main Street Suite 530

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorney

DACORSI PLACENCIO PC

21031 Ventura Blvd Suite 640

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER-CONFIDENTIAL DESIGN. ONLY FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER-CONFIDENTIAL DESIGN. ONLY FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CINDY RUIZ.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CINDY RUIZ.

DEFENDANT NOTICE TO INTENT TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY TELEPHONE FILED.

DEFENDANT NOTICE TO INTENT TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY TELEPHONE FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CINDY RUIZ

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CINDY RUIZ

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE FILED BY CINDY RUIZ.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE FILED BY CINDY RUIZ.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY DACORSI PLACENCIO PC.

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY DACORSI PLACENCIO PC.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH FEES OF $81.90.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH FEES OF $81.90.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0023 $435.00; 171030-0023-CK Reference Number 3577930

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/02/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; COURT REPORTER ALICIA LINDSEY 13895; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL B MINER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CINDY RUIZ.; ATTORNEY MICHAEL M HERNANDEZ APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT SETS TRIAL DATES AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 12/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/02/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 10 DAYS.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 10 DAYS; JURY DEMANDED BY BOTH SIDES.; JURY FEES TO BE POSTED WITHIN 10 DAYS. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE DEEMED A WAIVER OF JURY; TRIAL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER-CONFIDENTIAL DESIGN. ONLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC FOR STIP/ORD FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180530-0156 $20.00; 180530-0156-CK Reference Number 3613789

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CINDY RUIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT NOTICE TO INTENT TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY TELEPHONE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171201-0358 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY DACORSI PLACENCIO PC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO AMERICAN BEEF PACKERS, INC SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH FEES OF $81.90.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CINDY RUIZ FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0023 $435.00; 171030-0023-CK Reference Number 3577930

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less