This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 18:23:28 (UTC).

RUDIN -V- VARGAS

Case Summary

On 04/14/2017 RUDIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VARGAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0815

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSHUA RUDIN

Defendants

ANTONIO MADERO

RAMON CEPEDA

NANCY SOLIS

ALICIA VARGAS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT A KRASNEY

362 West 6Th Street

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1129

 

Court Documents

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY NANCY SOLIS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY NANCY SOLIS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 05/22/17 AS TO ROBERT A KRASNEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 05/22/17 AS TO ROBERT A KRASNEY, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY RAMON CEPEDA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY RAMON CEPEDA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEF MOTION RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEF MOTION RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/18/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOSHUA RUDIN (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/18/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOSHUA RUDIN (IMAGED)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ALICIA VARGAS; PARTY SERVED ON 04/18/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ALICIA VARGAS; PARTY SERVED ON 04/18/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DEMURRER FILED BY RAMON CEPEDA; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY RAMON CEPEDA; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION BY MAIL ON 04/22/17 AS TO ROBERT A KRASNEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION BY MAIL ON 04/22/17 AS TO ROBERT A KRASNEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY MAIL ON 04/21/17 AS TO ROBERT A KRASNEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY MAIL ON 04/21/17 AS TO ROBERT A KRASNEY, FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY ALICIA VARGAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY ALICIA VARGAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170414-0212 $255.00

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISIFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170630-0281 $25.00; 170630-0281-CK Reference Number 03127

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • WRIT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NO ATTACHMENT PAGE RECEIVED FOR NANCY SOLIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/14/2017 OF JOSHUA RUDIN; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:47; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: R. DURAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT KRASNEY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF JOSHUA RUDIN PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ALICIA VARGAS, ANTONIO MADERO, RAMON CEPEDA, NANCY SOLIS; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; ALICIA VARGAS, ANTONIO MADERO, RAMON CEPEDA, NANCY SOLIS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- JOSHUA RUDIN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ALICIA VARGAS, ANTONIO MADERO, RAMON CEPEDA, NANCY SOLIS.; JUDGMENT FOR: JOSHUA RUDIN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALICIA VARGAS, ANTONIO MADERO, RAMON CEPEDA, NANCY SOLIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $480.00 AND DAMAGES $1,869.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,349.00; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ALICIA VARGAS, ANTONIO MADERO, RAMON CEPEDA, NANCY SOLIS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER 000100 FILED BY 0005; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ALICIA VARGAS IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ALICIA VARGAS FOR 1ST PAPER FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ALICIA VARGAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/20/17 AS TO ROBERT A KRASNEY, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY ALICIA VARGAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.66.--BEGINNING ON 04/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170414-0212 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less