This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 03:07:30 (UTC).

RUBEN VASQUEZ JR -N- RUTH RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 RUBEN VASQUEZ JR -N- RUTH RAMIREZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3583

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUBEN VASQUEZ JR

Respondent

RUTH RAMIREZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 10/27/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • NEJ MAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 07/26/17 BY RUBEN VASQUEZ JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 04/26/2017 OF RUBEN JR FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 04/26/2017 OF RUBEN JR ORDERED ENTERED 07/26/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RUBEN VASQUEZ JR FOR PRE/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0944 $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RUTH RAMIREZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 04/26/2017 OF RUBEN JR AS TO RUTH RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RUBEN VASQUEZ JR

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RUBEN VASQUEZ JR IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF RUBEN VASQUEZ JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RUBEN VASQUEZ JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RUBEN VASQUEZ JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.