This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/10/2018 at 03:17:17 (UTC).

ROYAL CARE -V- JAWOROWSKI

Case Summary

On 01/18/2011 ROYAL CARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAWOROWSKI. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0124

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROYAL CARE MEDICAL

Defendant

JOHN JAWOROWSKI

Assignee

TRANSCON FINANCIALINC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

TALKOV, RONALD B

13051 Central Avenue

Chino, CA 91710

 

Court Documents

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110708-0091 $25.00; 110708-0091-CK Reference Number 5296

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/18/2011 OF ROYAL CARE MEDICAL FILED ADDING TRANSCON FINANCIALINC. AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. (IMAGED)

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/18/2011 OF ROYAL CARE MEDICAL FILED ADDING TRANSCON FINANCIALINC. AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ROYAL CARE MEDICAL FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ROYAL CARE MEDICAL FILED. (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOHN JAWOROWSKI. PARTY SERVED ON 02/09/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $54.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOHN JAWOROWSKI. PARTY SERVED ON 02/09/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $54.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110118-2645 $30.00

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ROYAL CARE MEDICAL FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ROYAL CARE MEDICAL FILED. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2016
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110708-0091 $25.00; 110708-0091-CK Reference Number 5296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • RONALD BRALKOV IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR TRANSCON FINANCIALINC., AND RONALD B TALKOV IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THERE IS AN ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT ON THIS CASE. THE CREDITOR SECTION NEEDS TO REFLECT THAT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/18/2011 OF ROYAL CARE MEDICAL FILED ADDING TRANSCON FINANCIALINC. AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/28/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; STEPHANIE THORNTON-HARRIS, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: I WILLIS; APPEARANCES:; ROYAL CARE MEDICAL REPRESENTED BY DESTINY PETTIFORD.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN JAWOROWSKI; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; JOHN JAWOROWSKI NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; 02:04; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; DESTINY PETTIFORD IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOHN JAWOROWSKI.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT ROYAL CARE MEDICAL HAVE &; RECOVER FROM JOHN JAWOROWSKI:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,100.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $84.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,184.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ROYAL CARE MEDICAL FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOHN JAWOROWSKI. PARTY SERVED ON 02/09/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $54.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110118-2645 $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ROYAL CARE MEDICAL FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less