This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 02:41:43 (UTC).

ROSARIO T GARCIA -N- ANTHONY GARCIA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 ROSARIO T GARCIA -N- ANTHONY GARCIA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1524

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Petitioner

ROSARIO T GARCIA

Respondent

ANTHONY GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEPT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

10565 Civic Center Dr, Ste 250

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2015
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ANTHONY GARCIA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • TERMINATION OF IWO IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): YOU MUST PROVIDE COPY OF BIRTH CERTIFICATE AND HIGH SCHOOL DIPLOMA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ANTHONY GARCIA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE RE: PAYMENT OF SUPPORT FILED (DCSS ADDED) BY MAIL ON 08/16/13 AS TO ANTHONY GARCIA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE RE: PAYMENT OF SUPPORT FILED (DCSS ADDED) BY MAIL ON 08/16/13 AS TO ROSARIO LEDESMA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • NOTICE RE: PAYMENT OF SUPPORT FILED (DCSS ADDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • ON THE DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/04/2011 OF ROSARIO GARCIA, THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0113617726

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2011
  • JDGMT PCKT RECVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110714-0561 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION/SUMMONS FILED AS TO ANTHONY GARCIA. PARTY SERVED ON 05/12/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4209 $395.00; 110504-4209-CK Reference Number 3855

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF ROSARIO T GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ROSARIO T GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less