This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:27:07 (UTC).

ROSALES -V- DIGNITY HEALTH

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 ROSALES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DIGNITY HEALTH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2116

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NANCY ROSALES

ALICIA ROSALES

Defendant

DIGNITY HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TIMD. WRIGHT

2227 West Live Oak Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90068

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BAKER TERRY, JR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY KRISTI HEDRICK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DIGNITY HEALTH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; TRIAL REQUESTED.; THERES DISAGREEMENT BETWEEN COUNSEL AS TO WHEN TRIAL DATES SHOULD BE SET. DEFENSE REPRESENTS; THEY RESERVED THE DATE OF 11/29/18 FOR A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; THE COURT IS NOT INCLINED TO SET TRIAL DATES TODAY AND INSTEAD CONTINUES TODAYS FURTHER; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE TO 11/29/18 TO BE HEARD ALONG WITH DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY; JUDGMENT.; COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO DISCUSS PRIVATE MEDIATION OR AN MSC. COUNSEL ARE TO ALSO DISCUSS TRIAL; DATES; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/29/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DIGNITY HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DIGNITY HEALTH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY D. WRIGHT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALICIA ROSALES.; ATTORNEY KRISTI K. HEDRICK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DIGNITY HEALTH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS THAT A DEPOSITION IS SET FOR JUNE AND ADR DISCUSSIONS; HAVE NOT BEEN HELD.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT REPRESENTS THAT ADDITIONAL WRITTEN DISCOVERY IS TO BE PROPOUNDED AND AGREES; THAT A DEPOSITION IS SET FOR 06/22/18. DEFENSE INTENDS TO FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT,; HOWEVER, A MOTION DATE HAS NOT BEEN RESERVED AT THIS TIME.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DIGNITY HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DIGNITY HEALTH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ANTHONY THOMASSIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALICIA ROSALES.; ATTORNEY KRISTI HEDRICK-FRALEY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; DEFENSE COUNSEL REPRESENTS THERE IS STILL THE POSSIBILITY THAT A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; WILL BE FILED.; THE COURT WILL CONTINUE MATTER FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES, AND ALSO TO ENCOURAGE COUNSEL TO; DISCUSS ADR OPTIONS AND TRIAL DATES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ALICIA ROSALES, NANCY ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DIGNITY HEALTH.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DIGNITY HEALTH SERVED ON 03/24/17 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALICIA ROSALES, NANCY ROSALES FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170406-0071 $2.00; 170406-0071-VS Reference Number 033-0014755039

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ALICIA ROSALES, NANCY ROSALES FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALICIA ROSALES, NANCY ROSALES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0612 $435.00; 170206-0612-CK Reference Number CK 2520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.