This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 09:38:13 (UTC).

ROSA SANCHEZ GOETTE -N- GERARDO GOETTE

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 ROSA SANCHEZ GOETTE -N- GERARDO GOETTE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5049

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROSA SANCHEZ GOETTE

Respondent

GERARDO GOETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHRISTINA FERRANTE

10700 Civic Center Drive Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • HEARING OSC DISMISSAL OF ACTION/FAILURE TO TRIAL (5 YEARS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • VOLUNTARY FAMILY LAW MEDIATION SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONF FILED BY GERARDO GOETTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERI CLARK; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: M LOZANO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTINA FERRANTE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PETITIONER ROSA SANCHEZ GOETTE PRESENT; RESPONDENT GERARDO GOETTE PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER OLGA RIOS # 300803 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR GERARDO GOETTE. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE/ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; SEE OTHER MINUTE ORDER THIS DATE FOR COURT PROCEEDINGS.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY GERARDO GOETTE RE: SS/PROP/ASSETS/RETIREMENT PENSIONS/HEALTH INS DIV (3/29/18); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERI CLARK; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: M LOZANO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTINA FERRANTE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PETITIONER ROSA SANCHEZ GOETTE PRESENT; RESPONDENT GERARDO GOETTE PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER OLGA RIOS # 300803 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR GERARDO GOETTE. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE/ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT INQUIRES OF PETITIONERS COUNSEL.; COURT INQUIRES OF RESPONDENT.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY BOTH PARTIES .; AFTER ARGUMENT,; BY ORAL STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES.; RICHARD MUIR IS TO PREPARE A QDRO DIVIDING THE PARTIES PENSIONS AND 401K. ALL FEES ARE TO BE; SPLIT BETWEEN THE PARTIES EQUALLY.; PARTIES STATE THEY WISH TO GO BACK TO VOLUNTARY MEDIATION IN REGARDS TO THE REMAINING ISSUES OF; VALUATION AND DIVISION OF PROPERTY.; PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO BRING ALL DOCUMENTS PERTAINING TO THE PROPERTY TO THE MEDIATION; DATE.; HEARINGS:; THE COURT REFERS THIS MATTER TO A VOLUNTARY FAMILY LAW MEDIATION SESSION. A ONE-HOUR BLOCK OF TIME HAS BEEN RESERVED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS: 09/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S45.; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54 (RULE 3.1380 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT SETTLED STATEMENTS SHALL BE FILED WITH THE DEPARTMENT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING); PARTIES SHALL REPORT TO DEPARTMENT S54 FOR HEARING IF NO AGREEMENT IS REACHED AT MEDIATION.; COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF/IE BY MAIL ON 06/22/18 AS TO CHRISTINA FERRANTE, ESQ., FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY GERARDO GOETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY GERARDO GOETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • PETITIONERS SUPP MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONF BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY GERARDO GOETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DISSO/SUPP DOCS BY MAIL ON 08/16/17 AS TO CHRISTINA FERRANTE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF GERARDO GOETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 06/14/2017 OF ROSA SANCHEZ GOETTE BY GERARDO GOETTE FILED. REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 170816-0062 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • VACATE SPOS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GERARDO GOETTE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170614-0752 $435.00; 170614-0752-CK Reference Number 1289

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S54

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.