Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 08:58:08 (UTC).

ROSA AGUILERA-V-NORTON CHINO LLC

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 ROSA AGUILERA-V-NORTON CHINO LLC was filed as a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2793

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ROSA AGUILERA

DAMIEN AGUILERA

Defendants

NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

MARIAN CHOU

LAKA JULIE WANG

JAVIER ZARAGOSA

CONNIE SCHOFIELD

Cross Plaintiff

NORTON CHINO, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

EDWARD M PALMER

229 N Riverside Ave

Rialto, CA 92376

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J. MA, APC

9420 Telstar Ave., Suite 128

El Monte, CA 91731

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

NOTICE OF RETURNED ABSTRACT SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED ABSTRACT SENT.; Minutes; ABSTRACT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: PLEASE USE FORM EJ-001 FOR ABSTRACT.; FORM FOR SUBMITTED ABSTRACT IS MISSING LINES 2-5 ON TOP PORTION AND LINES 10-12 ARE MISSING ON THE; BOTTOM PORTION. PLEASE REVISE LINE 1A, AND PROVIDE COMPLETE NAME FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR. ALSO,; LINE 4 ON YOUR ABSTRACT INDICATES 2 DEBTORS. THERE IS ONLY ONE DEBTOR ORDERED THE JUDGMENT; AGAINST. ALSO, LINE 6 TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT DOES NOT MATCH JUDGMENT.

SUPPLMNTAL DECL OF EDWARD PALMER INSPPRT OFMTN FOR ATTY FEES. HRG 3/20/17 FILED.

SUPPLMNTAL DECL OF EDWARD PALMER INSPPRT OFMTN FOR ATTY FEES. HRG 3/20/17 FILED.

REPLY TO DEF OPPO TO MOTION RE: ATTORNEY FEES SET FOR HEARING ON 03/15/17 FILED BY ROSA AGUILERA, DAMIEN AGUILERA. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO DEF OPPO TO MOTION RE: ATTORNEY FEES SET FOR HEARING ON 03/15/17 FILED BY ROSA AGUILERA, DAMIEN AGUILERA. (IMAGED)

PLA P&A IN OPPO TO NORTON CHINO MTN FOR JDGMNT NTWITHSTNDING THE VERDCT. HRG 3/15/17 FILED.

PLA P&A IN OPPO TO NORTON CHINO MTN FOR JDGMNT NTWITHSTNDING THE VERDCT. HRG 3/15/17 FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: ATTORNEY FEES SET FOR HEARING ON 03/15/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: ATTORNEY FEES SET FOR HEARING ON 03/15/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO CORRECT JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/02/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSA AGUILERA, DAMIEN AGUILERA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO CORRECT JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/02/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSA AGUILERA, DAMIEN AGUILERA (IMAGED)

JOINT WITNESS LIST FILED.

JOINT WITNESS LIST FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY ROSA AGUILERA, DAMIEN AGUILERA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY EDWARD M PALMER.

ANSWER FILED BY ROSA AGUILERA, DAMIEN AGUILERA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY EDWARD M PALMER.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2015 OF ROSA AGUILERA BY NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2015 OF ROSA AGUILERA BY NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JAVIER ZARAGOSA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/10/15 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JAVIER ZARAGOSA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/10/15 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CONNIE SCHOFIELD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/10/15 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CONNIE SCHOFIELD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/10/15 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED SERVED ON 09/25/15 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED SERVED ON 09/25/15 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LAKA JULIE WANG SERVED ON 09/25/15 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LAKA JULIE WANG SERVED ON 09/25/15 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED ABSTRACT SENT.; Minutes; ABSTRACT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: PLEASE USE FORM EJ-001 FOR ABSTRACT.; FORM FOR SUBMITTED ABSTRACT IS MISSING LINES 2-5 ON TOP PORTION AND LINES 10-12 ARE MISSING ON THE; BOTTOM PORTION. PLEASE REVISE LINE 1A, AND PROVIDE COMPLETE NAME FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR. ALSO,; LINE 4 ON YOUR ABSTRACT INDICATES 2 DEBTORS. THERE IS ONLY ONE DEBTOR ORDERED THE JUDGMENT; AGAINST. ALSO, LINE 6 TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT DOES NOT MATCH JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES IS GRANTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $70,472.50.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 5/3/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STIP RE:RELEVANT PORTION OF DEFS DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS & PLA RESPONSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; PLAINTIFFS TO RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NORTON CHINO, LLC. STATUTORY DAMAGES OF $36000.00; PLEASE SEE JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL FOR SPECIFICS AND DETAILS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD PALMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; LAW OFFICES OF JOHNJ. MA, APC FOR NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: JUDGMENT SUBMITTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • MOTION RE: FOR AWARDING REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT V GARCIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD PALMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JOHN JINGSHENG MA PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED'S MOTION FOR AWARDING REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES IS HEARD.; AFTER ARGUMENT,; COURT FINDS:; NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED'S MOTION FOR AWARDING REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • MOTION RE: FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSA AGUILERA, DAMIEN AGUILERA; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT V GARCIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD PALMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JOHN JINGSHENG MA PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; ROSA AGUILERA, DAMIEN AGUILERA'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS IS HEARD.; COURT RECITES ITS TENTATIVE RULING.; AFTER ARGUMENT,; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; COUNSEL TO SUBMIT STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY THAT WAS REQUESTED AND DISCOVERY SUBMITTED.; STIPULATION WILL NEED TO BE SUBMITTED TO DEPARTMENT S26 WITHIN FIVE BUSINESS DAYS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; COURT ORDERS CSR REGINA VEGA TO PREPARE A TRANSCRIPT OF THE PROCEEDINGS DATED 03/20/17.; ==MINUTE ORDER CHANGED OR CORRECTED BY N. AVAKIAN; CHANGES MADE ARE AS FOLLOWS: REQUEST TRANSCRIPT ==; ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 05/02/17 ====

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLMNTAL DECL OF EDWARD PALMER INSPPRT OFMTN FOR ATTY FEES. HRG 3/20/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF NORTON CHINO REBUTTAL TO PLA SUPPLMNTL DECL OF EDWARD PALMER. HRG 3/20/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO NORTON CHINO, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED SERVED ON 09/25/15 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LAKA JULIE WANG SERVED ON 09/25/15 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2015 OF ROSA AGUILERA, MARIAN CHOU, LAKA JULIE WANG, JAVIER ZARAGOSA, CONNIE SCHOFIELD IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROSA AGUILERA, DAMIEN AGUILERA FOR 1ST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 150903-2389 $435.00; 150903-2389-CK Reference Number 18601

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37

    Read MoreRead Less