This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2018 at 03:54:20 (UTC).

ROOFING SUPPLY -V- SUN REAL ESTATE, ETAL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2011 ROOFING SUPPLY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUN REAL ESTATE, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3728

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

SWGI SOUTHWEST GROUP INC

SUN REAL ESTATE LLP

KURT BARSOTTI

Cross Defendants

BROWNSTONE LOFTS, LLC

TODD COLLEY

SWGI SOUTHWEST GROUP INC

ASR CONSTRUCTORS, INC

TAISEI CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STOEL RIVES LLP

900 Sw Fifth Ave Ste 2600

Portland, OR 97204-1268

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHARLTON WEEKS LLP

1031 West Avenue M-14, Suite A

Palmdale, CA 93551-1443

LANAK & HANNA

625 The City Drive South Ste 190

Orange, CA 92868

Cross Defendant Attorneys

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA, LLP

2603 Main St. 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614-6232

LEONIDOU & ROSIN

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2013
  • HEARING RE: DEFAULT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/13/2011 OF ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERNCALIFORNIA FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/13/2011 OF ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERNCALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 09/04/13; JUDGMENT FOR: ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERNCALIFORNIA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SWGI SOUTHWEST GROUP INC, KURT BARSOTTI; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $33,556.44 INTEREST $2,763.58 ATTORNEY FEES $4,364.00 COSTS $1,326.80 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $42,010.82; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • HEARING RE: DEFAULT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: GABRIELA LEE; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT D ANDRADE; APPEARANCES:; STOEL RIVES LLP FOR ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERNCALIFORNIA NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR DEFAULT/DISMISSAL.; COURT FINDS THAT JUDGMENT PACKET HAD BEEN RETURNED FOR CORRECTIONS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/16/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON SWGI SOUTHWEST GROUP INC, KURT BARSOTTI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • JUDGMENT PACKET TRACKED TO JUDGMENT SHELF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMETN IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FORM CIV-100 #1D IS INCOMPLETE PLEASE COMPLETE AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECD

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO SUN REAL ESTATE LLP. PARTY SERVED ON 04/27/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PARTY NEEDS TO FILE ANSWER THE SAME AS THEY WERE SUED OR INDICATE IF ERRONEOUSL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/13/2011 OF ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERNCALIFORNIA, AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY, ONTARIO LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC, SWGI SOUTHWEST GROUP INC, KURT BARSOTTI IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/13/2011 OF ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERNCALIFORNIA FOR SUN REAL ESTATE LLP, ADD SUN COMPANIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/13/2011 OF ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERNCALIFORNIA FOR SUN REAL ESTATE LLP, ADD DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/13/2011 OF ROOFING SUPPLY GROUP - SOUTHERNCALIFORNIA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110413-4370 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less