This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:41:13 (UTC).

RONNIE G BARTON

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 RONNIE G BARTON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0993

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAMARA S JACOBI

Decedent

RONNIE G BARTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CALDWELL, KENNEDY & PORTER

15476 West Sand Avenue

Victorville, CA 92392

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI.

NOTICE TO CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI.

NOTICE TO DEPT. OF HEALTH SERVICES TO FILE OR PRESENT ETC FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI.

NOTICE TO DEPT. OF HEALTH SERVICES TO FILE OR PRESENT ETC FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI.

NOTICE TO DEPT. OF HEALTH SERVICES TO FILE OR PRESENT ETC FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI.

NOTICE TO DEPT. OF HEALTH SERVICES TO FILE OR PRESENT ETC FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI.

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, TAMARA S JACOBI APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK B WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, TAMARA S JACOBI APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK B WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF TAMARA S JACOBI AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER BRENDA ELIA 11830; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEANNE KENNEDY PRESENT FOR TAMARA JACOBI.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 07/31/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • HRG OF 07/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FINAL ACCOUNT AND ETC RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • HRG OF 07/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • VERIFICATION SIGNATURE TO WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FINAL REPORT OF ADMIN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/18/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FINAL ACCT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TAMARA S JACOBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TAMARA S JACOBI FOR PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0246 $465.00; 171004-0246-CK Reference Number 18714

    Read MoreRead Less