This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:04:48 (UTC).

RONALD K. LYON, JR.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 RONALD K LYON, JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1000

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEE ANN LYON

Decedent

RONALD K. LYON JR

Other

STATE OF CALIFORNIFRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

H. RAYMOND SAVOIAN

13 Calle Viento

Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275

 

Court Documents

MAILING COVER SHEET 07/31/18 (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET 07/31/18 (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET 07/31/18 (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET 07/31/18 (IMAGED)

HRG OF 07/25/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/25/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/25/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/25/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ELECTION TO HAVE PROPERTY ADMINISTERED FILED.

ELECTION TO HAVE PROPERTY ADMINISTERED FILED.

ELECTION TO HAVE PROPERTY ADMINISTERED FILED.

ELECTION TO HAVE PROPERTY ADMINISTERED FILED.

HRG OF 07/31/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/31/18 - PROBATE NOTES

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - LEE ANN LYON FILED.

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - LEE ANN LYON FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT FILED.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $18,045.48.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $18,045.48.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOAR FILED BY LEE ANN LYON.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOAR FILED BY LEE ANN LYON.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LEE ANN LYON

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LEE ANN LYON

WILL LODGED RECEIPT PLACED IN FILE

WILL LODGED RECEIPT PLACED IN FILE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LEE ANN LYON

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LEE ANN LYON

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVER SHEET 07/31/18 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER DIANE HICKMAN 13147; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; MATTER IS CONTINUED TO JANUARY 29, 2019.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/29/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 07/31/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PTN FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE & ORDR IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SEE ATTACHED PROBATE EMAINERS NOTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/31/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/31/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LEE ANN LYON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WILL LODGED RECEIPT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LEE ANN LYON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161006-0174 $465.00; 161006-0174-CK Reference Number 140495

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.