This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:41:26 (UTC).

RONALD BOSCH

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 RONALD BOSCH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0995

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAMES BOSCH

Decedent

RONALD BOSCH

Not Classified By Court

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RANDOLPH R MELENDEZ

12960 Central Ave St A

Chino, CA 91710

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, JAMES BOSCH APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND 376,000.00, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, JAMES BOSCH APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND 376,000.00, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/04/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/04/18 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL TO ADDRESS ISSUES AND DIFIENCIES IN PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO ADDRESS ISSUES AND DIFIENCIES IN PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 01/04/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/04/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

AMENDED NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

AMENDED NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JAMES BOSCH

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JAMES BOSCH

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JAMES BOSCH

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JAMES BOSCH

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION BY MAIL ON 03/05/18 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JAMES BOSCH FOR CERTIFIED COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 180423-0293 $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • SURETY BOND ISSUED JAMES BOSCH IN THE AMT OF $376,000 BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • ON THE PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/04/2017 OF JAMES BOSCH, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY IS ADDED AS A BONDING COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, JAMES BOSCH APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND 376,000.00, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RANDOLPH MELENDEZ PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; CATHY BOSCH PRESENT.; JAMES BOSCH PRESENT.; BRITTNY MONTIEL PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/04/2017 OF JAMES BOSCH IS GRANTED; JAMES BOSCH IS/ARE APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: ADMINISTRATOR; IS AUTHORIZED TO ADMINISTER ESTATE UNDER IAEA WITH FULL POWERS.; BOND REQUIRED $376,000.00; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 03/14/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/04/2017 OF JAMES BOSCH ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JAMES BOSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JAMES BOSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JAMES BOSCH FOR PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0298 $465.00; 171004-0298-MC Reference Number 031-0048590165

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less