This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/13/2021 at 01:43:41 (UTC).

ROMERO-V-XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 ROMERO-V-XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1983

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Foster, Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XOCHIL ROMERO

ROMERO, XOCHIL

Defendants

XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP

EMPLOYEE COOK

EL TORITO ONTARIO

EL TORITO ONTARIO A CALIFORNIA NUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

EMPLOYEE COOK DOE 1 AND INDIVIDUAL

XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS, ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE HILL LAW FIRM

Attorney at The Hill Law Firm

3200 Guasti Rd.

Ontario, CA 91761

Defendant Attorney

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

 

Court Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

05/11/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

04/27/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

02/09/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Notice of Ruling Filed

01/15/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/08/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

ANSWER FILED BY XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP; PARTY

11/03/2020: ANSWER FILED BY XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP; PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER-MTN TO STRIKE OFF CALEND

10/06/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER-MTN TO STRIKE OFF CALEND

DEMURRER FILED BY XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP; REPR

08/31/2020: DEMURRER FILED BY XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP; REPR

NOTICE IMAGED

07/08/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

07/08/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

07/08/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

07/08/2020: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSubstituted Service; Served: 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed; Comment: on Trial setting conference and notice of continuance of trial setting conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Waived for; Comment: FILING FEE WAIVED ON XOCHIL ROMERO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY XOCHIL ROMERO IS GRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed; Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY XOCHIL ROMERO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP is a litigant