This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 19:16:18 (UTC).

ROIC CALIFORNIA VS GALARZE

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 ROIC CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GALARZE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1955

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC

Defendant

RAYMOND V GALARZE JR

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Dr St 900-C

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

CURD, GALINDO, SMITH

301 E Ocean Blvd Ste 1700

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF PARTIAL PAYMENT FILED BY ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF PARTIAL PAYMENT FILED BY ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED BACK WITH SASE)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED BACK WITH SASE)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/22/2017 OF ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC ORDERED ENTERED 04/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAYMOND V GALARZE JR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RAYMOND V GALARZE JR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAYMOND V GALARZE JR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAYMOND V GALARZE JR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OF 3 DAY NOTICE BY POSTING/MAILING ON 03/04/17 AS TO RAYMOND V GALARZE, JR DBA HAUS OF ROYALS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OF 3 DAY NOTICE BY POSTING/MAILING ON 03/04/17 AS TO RAYMOND V GALARZE, JR DBA HAUS OF ROYALS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON RAYMOND V GALARZE JR; POSTED ON 03/29/17 WITH FEES OF $89.95.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON RAYMOND V GALARZE JR; POSTED ON 03/29/17 WITH FEES OF $89.95.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/29/17 WITH FEES OF $44.95.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/29/17 WITH FEES OF $44.95.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL PAYMENT FILED BY ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL PAYMENT FILED BY ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170322-0201 $255.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS ON BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (IMAGED); Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DISMISSAL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170605-0002 $3.00; 170605-0002-VS Reference Number VISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER RE: VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND WITHDRAW WRIT FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/22/2017 OF ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RAYMOND V GALARZE JR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO RAYMOND V GALARZE JR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/22/2017 OF ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC AND ALL PARTIES SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • APPLICATION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • NOTICE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY RAYMOND V GALARZE JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/22/2017 OF ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC FOR RAYMOND V GALARZE JR, ATTORNEY CURD, GALINDO, SMITH ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL PAYMENT FILED BY ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF PARTIAL PAYMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170329-0291 $20.00; 170329-0291-CK Reference Number 29249

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/22/2017 OF ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC FOR RAYMOND V GALARZE JR, ADD HAUS OF ROYALS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $6,368.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $146.13.--BEGINNING ON 04/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170322-0201 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.