This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 06:11:04 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ-V-RIVAS

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 RODRIGUEZ-V-RIVAS was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1747

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASMINE RODRIGUEZ

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER RIVAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHARIFI FIRM, PLC

11150 Olympic Boulevard Suite 1080

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTOPHER RIVAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTOPHER RIVAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTOPHER RIVAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JASMINE RODRIGUEZ FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0543 $10.00; 161221-0543-VS Reference Number 026-0002030871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JASMINE RODRIGUEZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0537 $435.00; 161221-0537-VS Reference Number 026-0002030871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.