This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:54:54 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ -v- QUIANZON, ETAL

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QUIANZON, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7187

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAIME ARLYN RODRIGUEZ

Defendants and Intervenors

EDILTORODIO P. QUIANZON, M.D.

JAMES M. LALLY, D.O.

CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER,

DAVID J. GONZALES, D.O.

ROBERT LOPEZ

DANIEL NELSON, D.O.

JAMES M LALLY EO

EDILTRODITO P. QUIANZON, M.D.

DAVID J GONZALEZ DO

DANIEL NELSON DO

VERITAS HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

EDILTRODITO P QUIANZON MD

CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

VERITAS HEALTH SERCIVES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAYNES ERICKSON

300 E State St. Suite 690

Redlands, CA 92373

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

Intervenor Attorney

LEM GARCIA LAW

1720 W Cameron Av Ste 210

West Covina, CA 91790

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/09/2016 OF JAIME RODRIGUEZ FILED BY JAIME ARLYN RODRIGUEZ, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/09/2016 OF JAIME RODRIGUEZ FILED BY JAIME ARLYN RODRIGUEZ, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF JAIME ARLYN RODRIGUEZ, ON 06/11/18

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/17/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S33 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 11 DAYS.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 09/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33; ACTION - COMPLETE

ANSWER FILED BY EDILTRODITO P QUIANZON MD; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY.

ANSWER FILED BY EDILTRODITO P QUIANZON MD; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY.

ANSWER FILED BY JAMES M LALLY EO, DAVID J GONZALEZ DO, DANIEL NELSON DO, VERITAS HEALTH SERCIVES INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY.

ANSWER FILED BY JAMES M LALLY EO, DAVID J GONZALEZ DO, DANIEL NELSON DO, VERITAS HEALTH SERCIVES INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDILTRODITO P QUIANZON MD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $81.65 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDILTRODITO P QUIANZON MD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $81.65 FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ROBERT LOPEZ

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ROBERT LOPEZ

NOTICE POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JAIME ARLYN RODRIGUEZ.

NOTICE POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JAIME ARLYN RODRIGUEZ.

MOTION RE: TO INTERVENE IN ACTION SET FOR HEARING ON 12/27/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT LOPEZ (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO INTERVENE IN ACTION SET FOR HEARING ON 12/27/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT LOPEZ (IMAGED)

ANSWER FILED BY JAMES M. LALLY, D.O., VERITAS HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY.

ANSWER FILED BY JAMES M. LALLY, D.O., VERITAS HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JAMES M. LALLY, D.O.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/31/16 WITH COSTS OF $134.90 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JAMES M. LALLY, D.O.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/31/16 WITH COSTS OF $134.90 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERT LOPEZ SERVED ON 08/30/16 WITH FEES OF $69.95.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERT LOPEZ SERVED ON 08/30/16 WITH FEES OF $69.95.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DANIEL NELSON, D.O.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/25/16 WITH COSTS OF $89.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DANIEL NELSON, D.O.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/25/16 WITH COSTS OF $89.95 FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160509-0870 $435.00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/17/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/09/2016 OF JAIME RODRIGUEZ FILED BY JAIME ARLYN RODRIGUEZ, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF JAIME ARLYN RODRIGUEZ, ON 06/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/27/16 UNABLE TO DISMISS ENTIRE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO EDILTRODITO P. QUIANZON, M.D. SERVED ON 08/29/16 WITH FEES OF $69.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DANIEL NELSON, D.O.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/25/16 WITH COSTS OF $89.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SERVED ON 08/25/16 WITH FEES OF $69.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/09/2016 OF JAIME RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL NELSON, D.O., CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER,, ROBERT LOPEZ IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160509-0870 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.