This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:21:03 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ V POPAL

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 RODRIGUEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against POPAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0997

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ

Defendant

TAMIM POPAL

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RESET (SECOND RESET); Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RESET (SECOND RESET); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:12; TAMIM POPAL HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; ANDRES PALACIOS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; CARLA PALACIOS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST TAMIM POPAL.; JUDGMENT FOR: ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TAMIM POPAL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,200.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $175.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,375.00; 11:26; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0370 $50.00; 161214-0370-CK Reference Number 118

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO TAMIM POPAL. PARTY SERVED ON 03/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $125.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO TAMIM POPAL. PARTY SERVED ON 03/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $125.00. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 05/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RESET (SECOND RESET); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:12; TAMIM POPAL HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; ANDRES PALACIOS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; CARLA PALACIOS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST TAMIM POPAL.; JUDGMENT FOR: ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TAMIM POPAL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,200.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $175.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,375.00; 11:26; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO TAMIM POPAL. PARTY SERVED ON 03/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $125.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0370 $50.00; 161214-0370-CK Reference Number 118

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.