This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:14:10 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ CARRIER -V- DAIMLER ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 RODRIGUEZ CARRIER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAIMLER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1272

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC.

Defendants

SELECTRUCKS OF LOSANGELES

VEHICLE VELOCITY GROUP

DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC

REDGATE TRUCK GROUP, LLC

LOS ANGELES TRUCK CENTERS, LLC

REDGATE PARTNERS, LLC

VEHICLE VELOCITY GROUP, A BUSINESS ENTITY

SELECTRUCKS OF LOSANGELES, A BUSINESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROY LEGAL GROUP

8345 Reseda Blvd Suite 222

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorneys

THE VANDERPOOL LAWFIRM

330 Main Street Suite 203B

Seal Beach, CA 90740

HAWKINS PARNELL THACKSTON & YOUNG LLP

445 South Figueroa Street Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

NELSON MULLINS, RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF QUESTIONS AND ANSWERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF QUESTIONS AND ANSWERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF QUESTIONS AND ANSWERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF QUESTIONS AND ANSWERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY REDGATE PARTNERS, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE VANDERPOOL LAWFIRM.

ANSWER FILED BY REDGATE PARTNERS, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE VANDERPOOL LAWFIRM.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO REDGATE PARTNERS, LLC, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO REDGATE PARTNERS, LLC, WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION RE: JOINDER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/24/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: JOINDER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/24/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC. (IMAGED)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MSJ FILED BY REDGATE PARTNERS, LLC.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MSJ FILED BY REDGATE PARTNERS, LLC.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION OF FRANK P AGELLO RE: STATUS OF REDGATE MTN... FILED

DECLARATION OF FRANK P AGELLO RE: STATUS OF REDGATE MTN... FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PRODUCTION OF DOCS SET FOR HEARING ON 11/13/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PRODUCTION OF DOCS SET FOR HEARING ON 11/13/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC, VEHICLE VELOCITY GROUP, LOS ANGELES TRUCK CENTERS, LLC, REDGATE PARTNERS, LLC.

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC, VEHICLE VELOCITY GROUP, LOS ANGELES TRUCK CENTERS, LLC, REDGATE PARTNERS, LLC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE REDGATE TRUCK GROUP, LLC FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE REDGATE TRUCK GROUP, LLC FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REPLY TO OPPO TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES SET FOR HEARING ON 11/13/18 FILED BY RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC.. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPO TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES SET FOR HEARING ON 11/13/18 FILED BY RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC.. (IMAGED)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • HEARING RE: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED 7 DAYS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (072419) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY FRANK AGELIO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC..; ATTORNEY RYAN COSGROVE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC.; ATTORNEY MICHAEL FAIRCHILD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR VEHICLE VELOCITY GROUP.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT/COUNSEL.; COURT NOTES DEMURRER HEARING IS ALSO CURRENTLY SET FOR 8/26/19.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONF SET FOR 11/07/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY LOS ANGELES TRUCK CENTERS, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE VANDERPOOL LAWFIRM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES TRUCK CENTERS, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC., VEHICLE VELOCITY GROUP, A BUSINESS ENTITY REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC., VEHICLE VELOCITY GROUP, A BUSINESS ENTITY, SELECTRUCKS OF LOSANGELES, A BUSINESS REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC. FOR LOS ANGELES TRUCK CENTERS, LLC, ADD VELOCITY VEHICLE GROUP.

    Read MoreRead Less
138 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0401 $3.00; 170208-0401-MC Reference Number 026-0004943801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC. FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0658 $37.00; 161215-0658-MC Reference Number 026-0001658053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RODRIGUEZ CARRIER,INC. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0655 $435.00; 161215-0655-MC Reference Number 026-0001658053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less