Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 04:15:26 (UTC).

ROC/MCDONNELL/KAPPE VS THOMASON/HARPER

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 ROC/MCDONNELL/KAPPE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against THOMASON/HARPER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4241

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROC III CA TERRACINA LLC

KAPPE TERRACINA LLC

MCDONNELL TERRACINA LLC

Defendants

BETTY THOMASON

LAURA HARPER

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID S SCHONFELD

801 E Chapman Ave Suite 214

Fullerton, CA 92831

 

Court Documents

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:10 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:10 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID SCHONFELD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT BETTY THOMASON, LAURA HARPER PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:38; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: POSSESSION NOT AN ISSUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 08:39; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:10 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:10 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BETTY THOMASON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/20/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BETTY THOMASON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/20/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY LAURA HARPER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY LAURA HARPER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY BETTY THOMASON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY BETTY THOMASON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170620-0530 $255.00

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:10 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID SCHONFELD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT BETTY THOMASON, LAURA HARPER PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:38; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: POSSESSION NOT AN ISSUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 08:39; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • RTS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DEFAULT/PROOF RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:10 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/20/2017 OF ROC III CA TERRACINA LLC AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BETTY THOMASON; PARTY SERVED ON 06/20/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/20/2017 OF ROC III CA TERRACINA LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: POWER OF ATTORNEY SENT DEPARTMENT F7 FOR REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY BETTY THOMASON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LAURA HARPER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • ANSWER WITH POWER OF ATTORNEY RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $48.83.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170620-0530 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID S SCHONFELD PROFESSIONAL LAW CORP - DAVID S. SCHONFELD