This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 06:41:52 (UTC).

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX V CLARK ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 ROBERTSON'S READY MIX filed an Other lawsuit against CLARK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Big Bear District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0015

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Big Bear District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD

Defendants

DANIEL PAUL CLARK

ERNEST J DE LA MOTTE

ANNE WILLSON DE LA MOTTE

DANIEL CLARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT M BINAM

200 S. Main St. Suite 200 Po Box 3600 Corona Ca 92878

Corona, CA 92882

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MARGARET A POWERS, JUDGE; CLERK: EILEEN CHRISTIANSEN; COURT REPORTER DEBBIE ROGERS 4639; BAILIFF: T JOHNSTON; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: LACK OF PROSECUTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • VACATE OSCDM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/06/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT H1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • ON COURT'S MOTION, THE OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING PRESENTLY SET IN THIS CASE, IS ORDERED RESET FOR 04/05/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT H1. NOTICE SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JOHN M TOMBERLIN, JUDGE; CLERK: EILEEN CHRISTIANSEN; COURT REPORTER DEBBIE ROGERS 4639; BAILIFF: T JOHNSTON; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY DIXIE ALLISON FOR PLAINTIFF COUNSEL.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DANIEL PAUL CLARK, DANIEL CLARK; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFF COUNSEL STATES THE THE DEFENDANT DEFAULTED ON A PAYMENT ARRAIGNMENT THAT WAS MADE; AND THEY WILL BE ENTERING A DEFAULT OF THE STIPULATED AGREEMENT..; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF TO FILE DEFAULT WITH COURT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/06/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT H1.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY DIXIE ALLISON.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LORENZO RAFAEL BALDERRAMA, JUDGE; CLERK: EILEEN CHRISTIANSEN; COURT REPORTER DEBBIE ROGERS 4639; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY DIXIE ALLISON FOR PLAINTIFF COUNSEL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS HAVE FILED A DISMISSAL ON TWO DEFENDANTS AND WILL POSSIBLY BE FILING; DISMISSALS ON REMAINING DEFENDANT. PLAINTIFF REQUEST A CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/06/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT H1.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF COUNSEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMON & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO DANIEL CLARK. PARTY SERVED ON 05/11/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $24.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMON & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO DANIEL PAUL CLARK. PARTY SERVED ON 05/11/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $44.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ANNE WILLSON DE LA MOTTE, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ERNEST J DE LA MOTTE, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • VACATE CMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/09/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT H1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • STAY OF EXECUTION GRANTED ON CASE. REASON: CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • COURT ORDERS MATTER STAYED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110505-3804 $402.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT H1

    Read MoreRead Less