This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 20:07:24 (UTC).

ROBERT OSCAR CLARK

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 ROBERT OSCAR CLARK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0674

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DALE CRAIG CLARK

Decedent

ROBERT OSCAR CLARK

Not Classified By Court

NICOLE CARTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MADDUX, MICHAEL C

1894 Commercenter Drive West Ste 108

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FULLERTON LEMANN SCHAEFER & DOMINICK

215 North D Street Suite 100

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1712

 

Court Documents

PETITION LETTERS OF SPECIAL FILED BY ADMINISTRATION(PROBATE).

PETITION LETTERS OF SPECIAL FILED BY ADMINISTRATION(PROBATE).

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON AMENDED 09/06/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON AMENDED 09/06/17 FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

HRG OF 09/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C MADDUX IN RE NOTICE OF SPECIAL ADMIN HRG FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C MADDUX IN RE NOTICE OF SPECIAL ADMIN HRG FILED

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY DALE CRAIG CLARK

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY DALE CRAIG CLARK

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $595.18.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $595.18.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, DALE CRAIG CLARK APPOINTED WITH - IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, DALE CRAIG CLARK APPOINTED WITH - IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/06/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/06/17 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 7/20, 7/27, 8/3/17 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 7/20, 7/27, 8/3/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/06/17 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/06/17 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DALE CRAIG CLARK

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DALE CRAIG CLARK

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DALE CRAIG CLARK

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DALE CRAIG CLARK

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF PAYMENT-MADE OF STATUTORY FEES AND EXPEN SES FILED BY PATRICK B WRIGHT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF STATUTORY FEES AND EXPENSES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • HRG OF 03/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • ORDER RE: PETITION OFR THE TERMINATION OF PROBATE PROCEEDINGS & DISCHARGE ETC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ZACHARY HAGENBUCH PRESENT FOR NICOLE CARTER.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY ZACHARY HAGENBUCH FOR ATTORNEY MICHAEL MADDUX.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); REPORTER WAIVED; COURT WILL ADVANCE THE 03/22/18 HEARING ON PETITION TO TERMINATE TO TODAYS DATE.; THE COURT GRANTS THE PETITION TO TERMINATE.; THE PROCEEDINGS IN THIS ESTATE ARE HEREBY TERMINATED, AND DALE CLARK IS DISCHARGED AS; SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • PETITION FOR FOR THE TERMINATION OF FURTHER PROBATE PROCEEDINGS AND FOR DISCHARGE OF THE PERSONAL REP; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ZACHARY HAGENBUCH PRESENT FOR NICOLE CARTER.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY ZACHARY HAGENBUCH FOR ATTORNEY MICHAEL MADDUX.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); REPORTER WAIVED; THE COURT ADVANCES THIS HEARING FROM 03/22/18 TO TODAYS DATE.; THE COURT GRANTS THE PETITION. THE PROCEEDINGS IN THIS ESTATE ARE TERMINATED AND DALE CLARK IS; DISCHARGED AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/22/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DALE CRAIG CLARK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION LETTERS OF SPECIAL FILED BY ADMINISTRATION(PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY DALE CRAIG CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.