This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:59:25 (UTC).

ROBERT G. RIVERA AKA ROBERT GARCIA RIVERA

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 ROBERT G RIVERA AKA ROBERT GARCIA RIVERA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1063

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

ROBERT RIVERA JR.

ANGELA VARGAS

SURTEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Decedent

ROBERT G. RIVERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

SARGENT, HANNAH

20880 Redwood Rd

Castro Valley, CA 94546

MCGUIRE, MARK H

KERN, ROBERT L

401 S Main Street Suite 105

Pomona, CA 91766

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND ISSUED ROBERT RIVERA, JR. IN THE AMT OF $20,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED ROBERT RIVERA, JR. IN THE AMT OF $20,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED ROBERT RIVERA, JR. IN THE AMT OF $20,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED ROBERT RIVERA, JR. IN THE AMT OF $20,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PETITION TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PETITION TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING HANNAH SARGENT WITH MARK H MCGUIRE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROBERT RIVERA JR..

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING HANNAH SARGENT WITH MARK H MCGUIRE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROBERT RIVERA JR..

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ROBERT RIVERA JR.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ROBERT RIVERA JR.

HRG OF 02/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR (EX-PARTE) REQUEST FOR APPT OF THE PROPONENT ETC FILED.

OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR (EX-PARTE) REQUEST FOR APPT OF THE PROPONENT ETC FILED.

DECLARATION OF HANNAH SARGENT FILED

DECLARATION OF HANNAH SARGENT FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/22/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/22/18 FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF ALL INTEREST IN ESTATE BY ROBERT RIVERA, JR. FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF ALL INTEREST IN ESTATE BY ROBERT RIVERA, JR. FILED.

DECLARATION OF HANNA SARGENT FILED

DECLARATION OF HANNA SARGENT FILED

OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF PUPORTED HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF PUPORTED HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

DECLARATION OF HANNAH SARGENT FILED

DECLARATION OF HANNAH SARGENT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX-PARTE APP. FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME ETC BY MAIL ON 12/27/17 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX-PARTE APP. FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME ETC BY MAIL ON 12/27/17 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING FILED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ROBERT RIVERA JR.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ROBERT RIVERA JR.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL (FIRST SESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR PROBATE, LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN W/LIMITED IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL, PARTIAL NO.1 FILED BY ROBERT RIVERA JR..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PARTIAL NO. ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER BRENDA ELIA 11830; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT KERN PRESENT FOR ANGELA VARGAS.; ATTORNEY THOMAS DOMINICK PRESENT FOR ROBERT RIVERA, JR.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY THOMAS DOMINICK.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 01/10/19 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • HRG OF 07/19/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • HRG OF 07/19/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING PROBATE REFEREE BM GARVIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AUTHORITY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ROBERT RIVERA JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • CHECK #1968 IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE COURT NO LONGER ACCEPTS PRE-PAYMENT FOR CERTIFIED COPIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT RIVERA JR. FOR FAX, FILING AND POSTAGE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171025-0776 $477.71; 171025-0776-VS Reference Number 031-0054435811

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less