This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 10:50:08 (UTC).

ROBERT BECKER-V-EASTSIDE SERVICE CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 ROBERT BECKER-V-EASTSIDE SERVICE CENTER was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5353

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT BECKER

Defendants

JASON BOATNER, AN

EASTSIDE SERVICE CENTER, AN ENTITY OF

JASON BOATNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY A DOUGLAS

5500 Bolsa Ave., Ste 201

Huntington Beach, CA 92649

Defendant Attorney

MILLIGAN, BESWICK LEVINE & KNOX

1447 Ford Street Suite 201

Redlands, CA 92374

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ROBERT BECKER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ROBERT BECKER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON BOATNER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON BOATNER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON BOATNER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON BOATNER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ROBERT BECKER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ROBERT BECKER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ROBERT BECKER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ROBERT BECKER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF C. PATRICK MILLIGAN BY MAIL ON 03/28/17 AS TO DISMISSAL OF DEF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF C. PATRICK MILLIGAN BY MAIL ON 03/28/17 AS TO DISMISSAL OF DEF, FILED.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON BOATNER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON BOATNER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ROBERT BECKER

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ROBERT BECKER

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY JASON BOATNER; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY MILLIGAN, BESWICK LEVINE & KNOX.

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY JASON BOATNER; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY MILLIGAN, BESWICK LEVINE & KNOX.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(RE: SETTLEMENT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385) FILED BY JASON BOATNER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CM-200 NTC OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE IS A MANDATORY USE FORM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER CARRIE LANE 8882; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY C. PATRICK MILLIGAN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REPORTS THAT THIS MATTER HAS SETTLED AND REQUESTS ASSIGNMENT OF AN OSC RE: DISMISSAL.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL(RE: SETTLEMENT) SET FOR 11/08/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ROBERT BECKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT BECKER FOR FAX FILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170831-0059 $4.00; 170831-0059-VS Reference Number 033-0031647558

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON BOATNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; JAMIE MCCRARY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ROBERT BECKER.; ATTORNEY STEPHEN LEVINE PRESENT FOR DEFT/JASON BOATNER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF DEFENSE COUNSEL.; REASON: COUNSEL TO MEET & CONFER RE: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ROBERT BECKER IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ROBERT BECKER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ROBERT BECKER FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.