Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:17:10 (UTC).

RIVERA -V- COLON

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 RIVERA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COLON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1568

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIEMMA RIVERA

Defendant

JOHN A COLON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN F MANSOUR

8280 Utica Ave Suite 150

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF MARIEMMA RIVERA ORDERED ENTERED 09/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MARIEMMA RIVERA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHN A COLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOHN A COLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JOHN A COLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JOHN A COLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/15/17 WITH FEES OF $10.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/15/17 WITH FEES OF $10.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON JOHN A COLON; POSTED ON 08/15/17 WITH FEES OF $110.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON JOHN A COLON; POSTED ON 08/15/17 WITH FEES OF $110.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0957 $279.24; 170711-0957-VS Reference Number 026-0056621147

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • WRIT/COPIES MAILED OUT THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF MARIEMMA RIVERA ORDERED ENTERED 09/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MARIEMMA RIVERA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHN A COLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOHN A COLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JOHN A COLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF MARIEMMA RIVERA AS TO JOHN A COLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/15/17 WITH FEES OF $10.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170906-0878 $44.74; 170906-0878-VS Reference Number 026-0066370093

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • COPIES MAILED TO ATTRNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIEMMA RIVERA FOR COPIES/FAX/MAIL/POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 170810-0055 $7.71; 170810-0055-VS Reference Number 026-0061738196

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170810-0050 $20.00; 170810-0050-VS Reference Number 026-0061738196

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0957 $279.24; 170711-0957-VS Reference Number 026-0056621147

    Read MoreRead Less