This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:29:15 (UTC).

RIOS-V-MWB COPY PRODUCTS, INC (**COMPLEX**)

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 RIOS-V-MWB COPY PRODUCTS, INC COMPLEX was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3071

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICARDO RIOS

Defendant

MWB COPY PRODUCTS,INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMMONDLAW, P.C.

1829 Reistertown Rd, Ste 410

Baltimore, MD 21208

 

Court Documents

ORDER AFTER FINAL ACCOUNTING FILED

ORDER AFTER FINAL ACCOUNTING FILED

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA FRANCISCO RE: DISBURSEMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA FRANCISCO RE: DISBURSEMENT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE LIST BY MAIL ON 06/25/18 AS TO ALAYA MEYERS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE LIST BY MAIL ON 06/25/18 AS TO ALAYA MEYERS, FILED.

ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED

ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONE BY MAILED ON 08/24/17 AS TO ALAYA MEYERS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONE BY MAILED ON 08/24/17 AS TO ALAYA MEYERS, FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION RE: JULIAN HAMMOND IN SUPP OF MOTION FOR FINAL FILED BY RICARDO RIOS

DECLARATION RE: JULIAN HAMMOND IN SUPP OF MOTION FOR FINAL FILED BY RICARDO RIOS

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY RICARDO RIOS.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY RICARDO RIOS.

ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED

ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED

JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION FILED AS TO MWB COPY PRODUCTS,INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 03/27/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $68.95.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION FILED AS TO MWB COPY PRODUCTS,INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 03/27/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $68.95.

DECLARATION OF RICARDO RIOS ISO MTN FOR PRELIM APPROVL FILED

DECLARATION OF RICARDO RIOS ISO MTN FOR PRELIM APPROVL FILED

MOTION RE: FOR ORDER GRANTING PRELIM APPRVL OF CLASS ACTION S SET FOR HEARING ON 05/09/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RICARDO RIOS (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR ORDER GRANTING PRELIM APPRVL OF CLASS ACTION S SET FOR HEARING ON 05/09/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RICARDO RIOS (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MWB COPY PRODUCTS,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $37.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MWB COPY PRODUCTS,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $37.95 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AFTER FINAL ACCOUNTING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA FRANCISCO RE: DISBURSEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE LIST BY MAIL ON 06/25/18 AS TO ALAYA MEYERS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170907-0225 $3.00; 170907-0225-CK Reference Number ck#3508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • VACATE CCMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • MOTION RE: FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • MOTION RE: FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RICARDO RIOS; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ARI CHERNIAK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR RICARDO RIOS.; ATTORNEY ALAYA MEYERS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MWB COPY PRODUCTS,INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; RICARDO RIOS'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT IS HEARD.; THE COURT RECITES ITS TENTATIVE RULING.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; COURT FINDS:; RICARDO RIOS'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 08/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RICARDO RIOS FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-0554 $435.00; 170221-0554-CK Reference Number D3544117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RICARDO RIOS FOR COMPLEX; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-0555 $1,000.00; 170221-0555-CK Reference Number D3544117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLEASE COMPLETE FORM WHERE INDICATED AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • GUIDELINES FOR THE COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM EMP TO EMPC

    Read MoreRead Less