Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 08:49:02 (UTC).

RIM PROPERTIES -V- CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 RIM PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHAVEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1905

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIM PROPERTIES

Defendant

VERONICA CHAVEZ

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0018 $25.00; 170823-0018-CK Reference Number 8103

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/04/2017 OF RIM PROPERTIES ORDERED ENTERED 08/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: RIM PROPERTIES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERONICA CHAVEZ; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VERONICA CHAVEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/26/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VERONICA CHAVEZ.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VERONICA CHAVEZ.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VERONICA CHAVEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 08/04/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $35.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VERONICA CHAVEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 08/04/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $35.00

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170804-0481 $255.00; 170804-0481-CK Reference Number 8080

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • WRIT SENT TO SO COURT SERVICES S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0018 $25.00; 170823-0018-CK Reference Number 8103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/04/2017 OF RIM PROPERTIES ORDERED ENTERED 08/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: RIM PROPERTIES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERONICA CHAVEZ; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VERONICA CHAVEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/26/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VERONICA CHAVEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/04/2017 OF RIM PROPERTIES AS TO VERONICA CHAVEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • REJ DEFAULT JDGMT PKT PLACED IN RIM BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • REJ DEFAULT JDGMT PLACED IN RIM BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DEFAULT JDGMT PKT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NO PROOF OF SERVICE INCLUDED FOR NAMED DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $570.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $35.67.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170804-0481 $255.00; 170804-0481-CK Reference Number 8080

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIM PROPERTIES is a litigant