This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 11:48:00 (UTC).

RIDGEMAN -V- HENLEY

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 RIDGEMAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HENLEY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0373

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENEE RIDGEMAN

Defendant

RAYMOND HENLEY

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN OVER COUNTER ON 10/31/17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN OVER COUNTER ON 10/31/17)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RAYMOND HENLEY; PARTY SERVED ON 10/06/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RAYMOND HENLEY; PARTY SERVED ON 10/06/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

ANSWER FILED BY RAYMOND HENLEY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY RAYMOND HENLEY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN OVER COUNTER ON 10/31/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER CONNIE OZBURN 10031; BAILIFF: S LEACH; MINUTES UPDATED BY NADINE GOLDEN; PLAINTIFF RENEE RIDGEMAN PRESENT; DEFENDANT RAYMOND HENLEY PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; (SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES); BOTH PARTIES ARE SWORN; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR: RENEE RIDGEMAN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAYMOND HENLEY; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RAYMOND HENLEY. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 11/05/17.; POSSESSION ONLY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171016-0042 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RAYMOND HENLEY IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY RAYMOND HENLEY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RENEE RIDGEMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less