This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 14:48:27 (UTC).

RIDGELINE-V-LATHAM

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 RIDGELINE-V-LATHAM was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0842

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIDGELINE APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

KATHY L. LATHAM

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSC.

3691 Adams St

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170320-0181 $25.00; 170320-0181-CK Reference Number 67343

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON KATHY L. LATHAM; POSTED ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON KATHY L. LATHAM; POSTED ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0251 $255.00; 170206-0251-CK Reference Number 65557

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KATHY L. LATHAM FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KATHY L. LATHAM FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/06/2017 OF RIDGELINE APARTMENTS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/16/17; JUDGMENT FOR: RIDGELINE APARTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHY L. LATHAM, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KATHY L. LATHAM, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170320-0181 $25.00; 170320-0181-CK Reference Number 67343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/06/2017 OF RIDGELINE APARTMENTS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/16/17; JUDGMENT FOR: RIDGELINE APARTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHY L. LATHAM, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KATHY L. LATHAM, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KATHY L. LATHAM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/06/2017 OF RIDGELINE APARTMENTS, LLC AS TO KATHY L. LATHAM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): INFORMATION ON #1A OF CIV-100 DOES NOT MATCH COURT RECORDS. PLEASE REVISE AND RESUBM.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/06/2017 OF RIDGELINE APARTMENTS, LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON KATHY L. LATHAM; POSTED ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170215-0199 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $3,900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $42.73.--BEGINNING ON 02/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0251 $255.00; 170206-0251-CK Reference Number 65557

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.