This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/12/2018 at 01:04:47 (UTC).

RICHARDS -V- RUIZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 RICHARDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0164

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALPHA RICHARDS

Defendants and Others

GRETCHEN A. RUIZ

GRETCHEN RUIZ

CLARENCE ALBERT LYON

JOHN RUIZ

MARJORIE LYON

JOHN M. RUIZ

CLARENCE A. LYON

ALPHA A. LYON

MARJORIE A. LYON

ALPHA E. RICHARDS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 07/27/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; COURT REPORTER ROSIE SAMPLES 12383; PETITIONER ALPHA RICHARDS PRESENT; DEFENDANT GRETCHEN RUIZ, JOHN RUIZ, CLARENCE ALBERT LYON, MARJORIE LYON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- ALPHA RICHARDS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; JEFFERY RICHARDS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; WENDY HEINRICH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; META ELLIS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; WITNESS -- GRETCHEN RUIZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- JOHN RUIZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- CLARENCE ALBERT LYON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- MARJORIE LYON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED IN COURT FOR REVIEW AND RETURNED IN OPEN COURT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/04/2011 OF ALPHA RICHARDS AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT ALPHA RICHARDS HAVE &; RECOVER FROM GRETCHEN RUIZ, JOHN RUIZ, CLARENCE ALBERT LYON, MARJORIE LYON:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $0.00; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF DEFENDANT:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT GRETCHEN A. RUIZ, JOHN M. RUIZ, CLARENCE A. LYON, MARJORIE A. LYON HAVE &; RECOVER FROM ALPHA E. RICHARDS:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $0.00; EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO ALPHA E. RICHARDS; PARTY SERVED ON 06/12/11 WITH COSTS OF $10.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOHN RUIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO GRETCHEN RUIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110708-2838 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARJORIE LYON. PARTY SERVED ON 07/05/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO CLARENCE ALBERT LYON. PARTY SERVED ON 07/05/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110706-1881 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 07/06/2011 OF GRETCHEN RUIZ, ALPHA A. LYON REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2011
  • DECLARATION OF DOCUMENTATION OF INCIDENT IN CHRONOLOGICAL ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • VACATE HSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/11 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ALPHA RICHARDS IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ALPHA RICHARDS FOR NEW SMALL CLAIMS FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ALPHA RICHARDS.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.