This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 14:49:24 (UTC).

RICHARD SMITH -V- DANIELLE SMITH DEBOISE

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 RICHARD SMITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DANIELLE SMITH DEBOISE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3135

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RICHARD SMITH

Respondent

DANIELLE SMITH DEBOISE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/06/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF RICHARD SMITH FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF RICHARD SMITH ORDERED ENTERED 11/21/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 11/07/17 BY RICHARD SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RICHARD SMITH FOR PRELIM/WVR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DANIELLE SMITH DEBOISE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF RICHARD SMITH AS TO DANIELLE SMITH DEBOISE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DANIELLE SMITH DEBOISE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RICHARD SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RICHARD SMITH IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON RICHARD SMITH FOR FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RICHARD SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V11

    Read MoreRead Less