This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:10:18 (UTC).

RICHARD MATHIAS -V- HI GRADE MATERIALS

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 RICHARD MATHIAS -V- HI GRADE MATERIALS was filed as a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1400

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD MATHIAS

Defendants

ROBAR ENTERPRISES,INC

HI GRADE MATERIALS, CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES

1502 North Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Defendant Attorney

KLINEDINST PC

501 W Broadway Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBAR ENTERPRISES,INC SERVED ON 11/25/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBAR ENTERPRISES,INC SERVED ON 11/25/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO SERVED ON 11/25/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO SERVED ON 11/25/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0803 $435.00; 171030-0803-CK Reference Number 3584150

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBAR ENTERPRISES,INC FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBAR ENTERPRISES,INC FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (5-10-18) FILED BY DEFENDANT HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO, ROBAR ENTERPRISES,INC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF TAKING DEMURRE5R OFF CALENDAR BY ELECTRONIC SVC ON 06/13/18 AS TO ATTY FOR PLTF, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR FILED BY HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO, ROBAR ENTERPRISES,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT/DISMISSAL FILED AS TO HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO, ROBAR ENTERPRISES,INC. PARTY SERVED ON 05/24/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RICHARD MATHIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ERRATA BY MAIL ON 05/11/18 AS TO RICHARD MATHIAS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF RICHARD MATHIAS AS TO HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HI GRADE MATERIALS,CO SERVED ON 11/25/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBAR ENTERPRISES,INC SERVED ON 11/25/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF RICHARD MATHIAS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0803 $435.00; 171030-0803-CK Reference Number 3584150

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less