This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:03:23 (UTC).

RICHARD F. MAYER -V- FOREMOST REAL ESTATE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 RICHARD F MAYER -V- FOREMOST REAL ESTATE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9012

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD F. MAYER

Defendants

FOREMOST REAL ESTATE III, LLC., A

LEONARD M. CRITES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

E. MARIE HENNING

1254 South Waterman Avenue Suite 07

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DEMAND OF $340,000.00 AND ORDER FILED.

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DEMAND OF $340,000.00 AND ORDER FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH E. MARIE HENNING AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RICHARD F. MAYER.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH E. MARIE HENNING AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RICHARD F. MAYER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LEONARD M. CRITES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LEONARD M. CRITES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH E. MARIE HENNING AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RICHARD F. MAYER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DEMAND OF $340,000.00 AND ORDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LEONARD M. CRITES FOR STIPULATION FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171219-0870 $20.00; 171219-0870-MC Reference Number 033-0046284023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LEONARD M. CRITES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171219-0867 $435.00; 171219-0867-MC Reference Number 033-0046284023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LEONARD M. CRITES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RICHARD F. MAYER FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0609 $435.00; 170927-0609-VS Reference Number #033-0035110964

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less