This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:43:12 (UTC).

RICHARD A CONTRERAS

Case Summary

On 12/21/2016 RICHARD A CONTRERAS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1257

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS

Decedent

RICHARD A CONTRERAS

Not Classified By Court

TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SMETHURST, BRIAN W.

4160 Temescal Canyon Rd Suite 410

Corona, CA 92883

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND FIXED AT $100,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND FIXED AT $100,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 03/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS

HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/15/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/15/17 - PROBATE NOTES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS

HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

MAILING COVERSHEET 05/14/18 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

MAILING COVERSHEET 05/14/18 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED 6/7/17 IN THE AMT OF $100,000.00 BY TRAVELERS INSURANCE FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED 6/7/17 IN THE AMT OF $100,000.00 BY TRAVELERS INSURANCE FILED.

HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRIAN SMETHURST PRESENT FOR RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: CLEAR PROBATE NOTES; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; THE COURT ORDERS RICHARD CONTRERAS AND/OR COUNSEL TO BE PRESENT AT NEXT HEARING IF ACCOUNTING IS; NOT FILED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTES OF 5/14/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVERSHEET 05/14/18 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180412-0461 $27.50

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADM W/FULL IAEA RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RICHARD ANTHONY CONTRERAS FOR PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADM; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0125 $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.