This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 15:47:47 (UTC).

REYES -V- CH LINE, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 REYES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CH LINE, INC . This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1938

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERNARDINO REYES

Defendants

CHONG HYUN LEE

CH LINE, INC

CHRISTIAN C LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF PARK& ZHENG

6 Venture, Suite 270

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW KIM APC

3701 Wilshire Blvd Suite 506

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180119-0250 $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO SET ASIDE THE DISMISSAL FILED.; Minutes; DISMISSAL ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/31/2017 OF BERNARDINO REYES IS ORDERED SET-ASIDE, THE CASE AND PARTIES ARE SET BACK TO ACTIVE STATUS.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: PLA APP FOR ORDER TO SET ASIDE THE DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS 4420; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STELLA K. PARK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER HEARD WITH FILE; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT FINDS THERE IS NO EMERGENCY.; EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED; COUNSEL STATES SHE WILL FILE STIPULATION WITH THE COURT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF EXPARTE FILED BY BERNARDINO REYES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: PLA APP FOR ORDER TO SET ASIDE THE DISMISSAL TO BE HEARD ON 09/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON BERNARDINO REYES FOR FAX FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $13.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON BERNARDINO REYES FOR EX-PARTE HEARING FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • COPY OF DENIED FEE WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR HRG PACKET MAILED TO PLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF BERNARDINO REYES IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY BERNARDINO REYES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.