This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/09/2021 at 04:10:25 (UTC).

REVCHEM COMPOSITES -V- BLACKHAWK MANUFACTURING

Case Summary

On 08/21/2014 REVCHEM COMPOSITES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLACKHAWK MANUFACTURING. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pacheco, John M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2459

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Pacheco, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REVCHEM COMPOSITES, INC.

REVCHEM COMPOSITES, INC

Defendants

BLACKHAWK MANUFACTURING, INCORPORATED

FLOYD SANDERS

CARLOS LARIOS

SERGIO LARIOS

SANDERS, FLOYD

LARIOS, CARLOS

LARIOS, SERGIO

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBAUM LAW GROUP LLC

Attorney at Greenbaum Law Group LLC

840 Newport Center Drive,#720

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF NATHAN SANDERS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF NATHAN SANDERS

27479 Diane Marie Circle

Saugus, CA 91350

LEWIN, ROBERT S

43980 Mahlon Vail #605

Temecula, CA 92592

Lewin, Robert Samuel

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTER

12/26/2018: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTER

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. JUDGMENT ON COMP

08/13/2015: SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. JUDGMENT ON COMP

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BLACKHAWK MANUFAC

08/10/2015: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BLACKHAWK MANUFAC

REVISED NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL & ORDER TO SHOW

07/07/2015: REVISED NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL & ORDER TO SHOW

PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST FILED.

06/26/2015: PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST FILED.

ORDER TO SEVER ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS CARLOS LA

03/19/2015: ORDER TO SEVER ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS CARLOS LA

CCP 998 OFFER OF SERGIO LARIOS TO ALLOW JUDGMENT F

03/09/2015: CCP 998 OFFER OF SERGIO LARIOS TO ALLOW JUDGMENT F

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY REVCHEM COMPOSITES, INC., F

03/09/2015: MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY REVCHEM COMPOSITES, INC., F

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BLACKHAWK MANUFAC

11/24/2014: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BLACKHAWK MANUFAC

ANSWER FILED BY FLOYD SANDERS; PARTY REPRESENTED B

11/03/2014: ANSWER FILED BY FLOYD SANDERS; PARTY REPRESENTED B

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

08/21/2014: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: MEMO COST--SECT 1&2 NEEDS $ AMOUNTS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CHECK 17113 RETURNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Sent re:; Comment: NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT. WRIT OF EXECUTION AMD CHECK #17059 ARE BEIMG RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S):MUST LIST ALL DEBTORS ON WRIT AS LISTED ON JUDGMENT. PLEASE REVISE AND RESUBMIT. THANK YOU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190710-0934; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 190710-0934-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190710-0934-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK#16995

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190403-0935; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY REVCHEM COMPOSITES, INC. FOR WRIT 190403-0935-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190403-0935-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 16711

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - San Bernardino; Comment: WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 199024.95 )

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2014
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $2,100.00; Total Payments and Credits: $2,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketUpdate Party Address; Comment: PARTY REVCHEM COMPOSITES, INC. UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketPrayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of; Comment: PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 10 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 03/14/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketPrayed for Amount and/or Damages in the Amount of; Comment: PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $146,812.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 140821-0448-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKHAWK MANUFACTURING GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIN, ROBERT S