This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:18:06 (UTC).

REO INTERNAT'L -V- CASTRO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 REO INTERNAT'L filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CASTRO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2090

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REO INTERNATIONAL CORP

Defendants

BEN LUNA

DIANE CASTRO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2011
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF REO INTERNATIONAL CORP GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: REO INTERNATIONAL CORP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DIANE CASTRO, BEN LUNA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $850.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $525.00 AND DAMAGES $1,076.54.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,451.54; ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • 585 JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 - 10 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • 585 JUDGMENT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DOLLAR AMOUNT OF DAILY DAMAGES DOES NOT MATCH YOUR DECLARATION - SEE WORKSHEET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • 585 JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • 585 JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): #7 ON REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DFLT - TOTAL DOESNT ADD UP TO $525.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/05/11 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BEN LUNA; PARTY SERVED ON 05/05/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF REO INTERNATIONAL CORP, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF FILING A UD RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF FILING A UD RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF FILING A UD RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4217 $255.00; 110504-4217-CK Reference Number 175744

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $850.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $28.33.

    Read MoreRead Less