This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 12:00:42 (UTC).

RENEE GARZA -V- STEPHEN A GARZA

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 RENEE GARZA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEPHEN A GARZA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2133

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RENEE GARZA

Respondent

STEPHEN A GARZA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 01/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/12/2017 OF RENEE GARZA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/12/2017 OF RENEE GARZA ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • AMENDED DECL FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • JUDGMENT PKT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • JUDGMENT/NOE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): (SEE ATTACHED NOTE FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT) *.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 10/18/17 BY RENEE GARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RENEE GARZA FOR PRELIM/FNL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • CLERK'S OFFICE RETURNED JUDGMENT/DDUD/DEC REG SERV FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: NEED 3 FL-190 FORMS COMPLETED/ALL DOCS MUST MATCH PETITION***.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STEPHEN A GARZA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • FEES ON FEE WAIVER ORDER OF 07/13/17 FOR DOCUMENT FILING FEE PAID IN FULL BY RENEE GARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR FILING FEE PAID BY RENEE GARZA IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0222 $435.00; 170721-0222-VS Reference Number 031-0029013005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF RENEE GARZA IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RENEE GARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.