This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 14:49:20 (UTC).

RENATA LOADER -N- MICHAEL LOADER

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 RENATA LOADER -N- MICHAEL LOADER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3134

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RANATA C LOADER

Respondent

MICHAEL J LOADER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BAWDEN & KOCHIS

300 East State Street Suite 430

Redlands, CA 92373

Respondent Attorney

HOLSTROM, BLOCK & PARKE

1897 California Avenue, Suite 102

Corona, CA 92881

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/04/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT VCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 08/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF RANATA LOADER FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF RANATA LOADER ORDERED ENTERED 08/08/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 07/30/18 BY MICHAEL J LOADER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • APPEARANCE STIPULATION WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONDENTS DEC OF DISCLOSURE BY MAIL ON 07/24/18 AS TO RICHARD BAWDEN, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MICHAEL J LOADER FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF RANATA LOADER FOR MICHAEL J LOADER, ATTORNEY HOLSTROM, BLOCK & PARKE ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • JUDGEMNT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION FILED BY RANATA C LOADER RE:RFO FILED BY MICHAEL J LOADER ON 12/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RDO BY MAIL ON 12/20/17 AS TO ELISABETH A LORD, ESQ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MICHAEL J LOADER FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171204-0435 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY MICHAEL J LOADER RE: MTN TO QUASH SVC OF SMMNS ON PTN FOR DISSO;DSMSS ACTION(120417).; Minutes; Receipt: 171204-0433 $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RANATA C LOADER FOR PRELIMINARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MICHAEL J LOADER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $270.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0478 $435.00; 171004-0478-CK Reference Number 18395

    Read MoreRead Less