This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:17:39 (UTC).

REGENCY EQUESTRIAN VS ARMADA

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 REGENCY EQUESTRIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARMADA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7480

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGENCY EQUESTRIANESTATES HOMEOWNERS

Defendants

ROBERT A ARMADA

JEANINE C ARMADA

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0246 $50.00; 170927-0246-CK Reference Number 1109

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT A ARMADA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/19/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $180.25.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT A ARMADA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/19/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $180.25.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JEANINE C ARMADA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/20/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $77.20.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JEANINE C ARMADA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/20/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $77.20.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:44; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; REGENCY EQUESTRIANESTATES HOMEOWNERS REPRESENTED BY STEVE PARRISH AND JANICE SARDINA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROBERT A ARMADA, JEANINE C ARMADA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; ROBERT A ARMADA, JEANINE C ARMADA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; STEVE PARRISH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; JANICE SARDINA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; 11:56; RECESS; 11:59; RECOVENE; COURT TRIAL RESUMES; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ROBERT A ARMADA, JEANINE C ARMADA.; JUDGMENT FOR: REGENCY EQUESTRIANESTATES HOMEOWNERS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT A ARMADA, JEANINE C ARMADA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,227.60 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $307.45 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,535.05; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 12:01; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF REGENCY EQUESTRIANESTATES HOMEOWNERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JEANINE C ARMADA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/20/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $77.20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT A ARMADA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/19/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $180.25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • POS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NAME MUST MATCH THE COMPLAINT. PLS CORRECT AND RE-SUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • ON THE CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF REGENCY EQUESTRIANESTATES HOMEOWNERS, JEANINE C ARMADA IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0246 $50.00; 170927-0246-CK Reference Number 1109

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PARTY ROBERT A ARMADA UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less