This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/26/2019 at 14:05:12 (UTC).

RAZO-V-GUETIERREZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 RAZO-V-GUETIERREZ was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6736

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANDACE M RAZO

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LUIS PACHECO FIGUEROA

OMAR DE JESUS GUTEIRREZ

CEVA LOGISTICS U.S., INC

LUIS MIGUEL GUTIERREZ

ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ

GRISELDA MATA CORDERO

CEVA GROUND US, LP

FERSIL TRANSPORT, INC.

OMAR DE JESU S GUTIERREZ

OMAR DE JESUS GUTIERREZ

CEVA LOGISTICS US,INC

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIZIO LAW FIRM, PC

2677 North Main Street Suite 225

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

4100 Newport Place Drive Suite 840

Newport Beach, CA 92660

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

LAW OFFICES OF KIML BENSEN

222 East Huntington Dr Ste 230

Monrovia, CA 91016

CHAVEZ LEGAL GROUP

11900 North 26Th St Ste 200

Edinburg, TX 78539

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED BY ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KIML BENSEN.

ANSWER FILED BY ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KIML BENSEN.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FERSIL TRANSPORT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/22/19 WITH COSTS OF $127.80 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FERSIL TRANSPORT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/22/19 WITH COSTS OF $127.80 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 04/17/19. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 04/17/19. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LUIS PACHECO FIGUEROA, CEVA GROUND US, LP.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LUIS PACHECO FIGUEROA, CEVA GROUND US, LP.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY OMAR DE JESUS GUTEIRREZ, LUIS MIGUEL GUTIERREZ.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY OMAR DE JESUS GUTEIRREZ, LUIS MIGUEL GUTIERREZ.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CANDACE M RAZO

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CANDACE M RAZO

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/15/2018 OF CANDACE RAZO BY GRISELDA MATA CORDERO

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/15/2018 OF CANDACE RAZO BY GRISELDA MATA CORDERO

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GRISELDA MATA CORDERO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GRISELDA MATA CORDERO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GRISELDA MATA CORDERO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/12/19 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GRISELDA MATA CORDERO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/12/19 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/11/2019 OF OMAR DE JESU GUTIERREZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/11/2019 OF OMAR DE JESU GUTIERREZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/15/2018 OF CANDACE RAZO BY OMAR DE JESUS GUTEIRREZ, LUIS MIGUEL GUTIERREZ

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/15/2018 OF CANDACE RAZO BY OMAR DE JESUS GUTEIRREZ, LUIS MIGUEL GUTIERREZ

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/15/2018 OF CANDACE RAZO BY LUIS PACHECO FIGUEROA, CEVA GROUND US, LP

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/15/2018 OF CANDACE RAZO BY LUIS PACHECO FIGUEROA, CEVA GROUND US, LP

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ SERVED ON 12/10/18 WITH FEES OF $65.76.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ SERVED ON 12/10/18 WITH FEES OF $65.76.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONSOLIDATION W/DS1906764/DISM(UNSVD DEFS)/TSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DEFENDANT ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KIML BENSEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY OMAR DE JESUS GUTIERREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CEVA GROUND US, LP FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 190712-0094 $8.50; 190712-0094-CK Reference Number 47335

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON JULY 10, 2019 HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 190711-0101 $11.00; 190711-0101-CK Reference Number 47314

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONSOLIDATION W/DS1906764/DISM(UNSVD DEFS)/TSC; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; LYNN P. WHITLOCK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CANDACE M RAZO.; PATTY THAMMALAIVIROJ APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GRISELDA MATA CORDERO.; BRANDON KELLY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR LUIS PACHECO FIGUEROA, CEVA GROUND US, LP.; ATTORNEY CORTNEY R. CARR PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ.; ATTORNEY SHAWN S. ROKNI PRESENT FOR DEFENDANTS OMAR AND LUIS GUTIERREZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING IS CONTINUED TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN RELATED CASE TO BE PRESENT.; COURT ORDERS COUNSEL TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PRIOR TO THE NEXT; HEARING.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/10/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28.; COUNSEL FOR ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FERSIL TRANSPORT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/22/19 WITH COSTS OF $127.80 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CEVA GROUND US, LP; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/07/18 WITH COSTS OF $63.90 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/15/2018 OF CANDACE RAZO, LUIS MIGUEL GUTIERREZ, GRISELDA MATA CORDERO, LUIS PACHECO FIGUEROA, CEVA GROUND US, LP, CEVA LOGISTICS U.S., INC, ERMELINDA VENEGAS VELAZQUEZ IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • PLAINTIFF CANDACE M RAZO FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CANDACE M RAZO FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 181015-0850 $435.00; 181015-0850-CK Reference Number 191460

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.