This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:44:28 (UTC).

RAY -V- GENERAL MOTORS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 RAY -V- GENERAL MOTORS was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3170

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACQUELINE RAY

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEMON LAW PRO

3017 Douglas Blvd Ste 300

Roseville, CA 95661

Defendant Attorney

THE ERSKINE LAW GROUP

3995 E La Palma Ave

Anaheim, CA 92807

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL DUE TO SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS RE: PTLF/DEFT FTA @TSC/TRIAL SETTING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY VINCENT ONORIO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JOSEPH DANKERT PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: CASE HAS SETTLED; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL DUE TO SETTLEMENT SET FOR 06/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DECLARATION OF VINCENT M. ONORIO, ESQ. RE NON-APPEARANCE 01/09/18 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NEITHER SIDE HAS APPEARED IN COURT THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS RE: PTLF/DEFT FTA @TSC/TRIAL SETTING SET FOR 02/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING RUBEN & SJOLANDER WITH THE ERSKINE LAW GROUP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR GENERAL MOTORS LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR JACQUELINE RAY.; Minutes; Receipt: 171219-0533 $150.00; 171219-0533-CK Reference Number CK 3308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY JACQUELINE RAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JACQUELINE RAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: SUMMONS + COMPLAINT + TRIAL SETTING CONF NOTICE RECEIVED BACK FROM LEMON LAW PRO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF JACQUELINE RAY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JACQUELINE RAY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0661 $435.00; 170711-0661-CK Reference Number 3220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF KIMBERLI ZAZZI FOR FILING OF COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less