This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:10:44 (UTC).

RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE -V- PAULA D NEGRON

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PAULA D NEGRON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9424

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC

Defendants

PAULA D NEGRON

ANGEL NEGRON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

106 South Mentor Ave Ste 150

Pasadena, CA 91106

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC ORDERED ENTERED 11/30/17; JUDGMENT FOR: RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PAULA D NEGRON, ANGEL NEGRON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $23,468.38 INTEREST $842.33 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $508.99 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $24,819.70; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF JOHN D GUERRINI ISO CLERKS JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF JOHN D GUERRINI ISO CLERKS JUDGMENT FILED

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PAULA D NEGRON, ANGEL NEGRON.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PAULA D NEGRON, ANGEL NEGRON.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PAULA D NEGRON SERVED ON 10/09/17 WITH FEES OF $83.99.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PAULA D NEGRON SERVED ON 10/09/17 WITH FEES OF $83.99.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ANGEL NEGRON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ANGEL NEGRON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0314 $380.00; 171004-0314-CK Reference Number 62922

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180122-0260 $25.00; 180122-0260-CK Reference Number 64723

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 01/11/51 AS TO ANGEL NEGRON, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE ATTACHMENT STATED AS INCLUDED IN #5 IS NOT ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC ORDERED ENTERED 11/30/17; JUDGMENT FOR: RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PAULA D NEGRON, ANGEL NEGRON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $23,468.38 INTEREST $842.33 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $508.99 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $24,819.70; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF RAPID CAPITAL FINANCE LLC AS TO PAULA D NEGRON, ANGEL NEGRON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PAULA D NEGRON SERVED ON 10/09/17 WITH FEES OF $83.99.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ANGEL NEGRON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0314 $380.00; 171004-0314-CK Reference Number 62922

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less