Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 23:51:03 (UTC).

RANA AHMED-N-ANAND BHONGE

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 RANA AHMED-N-ANAND BHONGE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2845

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RANA AHMED

Respondent

ANAND BHONGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CAO, LUAT

1300 E Main St 203

Alhambra, CA 91801

Respondent Attorney

MAYER, BRIAN

337 N Vineyard Ave Suite 400

Ontario, CA 91764

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JESSICA FLORES; COURT REPORTER SOPHIA WISE 12008; BAILIFF: L SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER RANA AHMED PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANAND BHONGE; BRIAN MAYER FOR ANAND BHONGE NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL); STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; IF RESPONDENT FAILS TO APPEAR AT THE TIME OF THE NEXT HEARING, COURT MAY PROCEED BY DEFAULT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S50.; I CERTIFY THAT A COPY OF THIS MINUTE ORDER WAS MAILED TO RESPONDENTS COUNSEL ON 06/06/18.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY RANA AHMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 04/03/2017 OF RANA AHMED BY ANAND BHONGE FILED. REPRESENTED BY BRIAN MAYER.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0040 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • PARTY RANA AHMED UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LUAT CAO WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RANA AHMED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RANA AHMED FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 170628-0059 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 04/03/2017 OF RANA AHMED FOR RANA AHMED, ADD SONIA RANA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170405-0959 $435.00; 170405-0959-CK Reference Number 466

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAO LUAT TRONG