This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 13:51:32 (UTC).

RAMOS, ETAL -v- BERRY, ETAL

Case Summary

On 01/24/2017 RAMOS, ETAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BERRY, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCarville, Brian S, Ochoa, Gilbert and Schumann, Tam Nomoto. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1351

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCarville, Brian S

Ochoa, Gilbert

Schumann, Tam Nomoto

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

HOLLIDAY ROCK CO

CONV

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

12/27/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

NOTICE OF RETURNED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SENT. THE

12/17/2018: NOTICE OF RETURNED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SENT. THE

DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. VANGA RE 11-27-18 OSC RE-

11/26/2018: DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. VANGA RE 11-27-18 OSC RE-

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NOE

06/08/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NOE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HOL

06/08/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HOL

PRIVILEGE LOG FILED.

04/24/2018: PRIVILEGE LOG FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NOE RAMOS.

02/26/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NOE RAMOS.

ANSWER FILED BY NOE RAMOS, ANA GONZALES DE RAMOS;

01/26/2018: ANSWER FILED BY NOE RAMOS, ANA GONZALES DE RAMOS;

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON ANA GO

12/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON ANA GO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON NOE RA

12/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON NOE RA

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

10/26/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY HOLLIDAY ROCK CO.,INC, H

10/23/2017: NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY HOLLIDAY ROCK CO.,INC, H

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF

10/17/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF

ANSWER FILED BY ANTHONY CURTIS BERRY, HOLLIDAY TRU

10/17/2017: ANSWER FILED BY ANTHONY CURTIS BERRY, HOLLIDAY TRU

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

10/13/2017: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RULING ON 7-25-17 FILED.

09/25/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON 7-25-17 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

09/20/2017: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

09/15/2017: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Sent re:; Comment: NOTICE OF RETURNED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SENT. THE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THERE IS A CROSS-COMPLAINT ON THIS CASE. IF DISMISSING AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION THE PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AND THE CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S ATTORNEY BOTH SHOULD SIGN OFF ON THE DISMISSAL. THE ATTORNEY FOR THE CROSS- COMPLAINANT HAS NOT SIGNED THE DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA;13709 COURT ATTENDANT S CARR - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ROBERT MORRIS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. ATTORNEY LAUREN E. VANGA PRESENT FOR DEFENDANTS. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS COMPLAINANTS. REASON: PENDING RECEIPT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/04/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30. NOTICE WAIVED. === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued Party's motion; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. VANGA RE 11/27/18 OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20170124-0683; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,890.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,890.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY NOE RAMOS, ANA GONZALEZ DE RAMOS FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE 170124-0683-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued on; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF NOE RAMOS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLLIDAY ROCK COMPANY INC. ERRONEOSLY SU is a litigant