Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/24/2018 at 18:59:38 (UTC).

RAMIREZ VS DEPUTY LUKACS, et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2011 RAMIREZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DEPUTY LUKACS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3528

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE A RAMIREZ

Defendants

DEPUTY LUKACS

SUPERVISOR FOR THESHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TERRELL, JAMES S

15411 Anacapa Road

Victorville, CA 92392

Defendant Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

385 North Arrowhead Avenue

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2013
  • HEARING RE: DISMISSAL(STATUS OF SETTLEMENT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • HEARING RE: DISMISSAL(STATUS OF SETTLEMENT); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN 10435; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES THEBEAU PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JAMES THEBEAU FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL INDICATES MATTER HAS SETTLED AND ADDITIONAL TIME IS NEEDED TO COMPLETE AGREEMENT; AND FILE DISMISSAL DOCUMENTS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/18/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENSE TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN 10435; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES S TERRELL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JAMES THEBEAU PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF BOTH COUNSEL.; REASON: PARTIES ARE WORKING TOWARDS AGREEMENT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: DISMISSAL(STATUS OF SETTLEMENT) SET FOR 02/27/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN 10435; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES TERRELL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY DAVID GUARDADO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT SUPERVISOR FOR THESHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; COUNSEL REPRESENTS PARTIES ARE WORKING TOWARDS RESOLUTION.; COURT CONTINUES MATTER AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/23/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S33; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MARSHA G SLOUGH, JUDGE; JUDGE IS AWAY FROM COURT, CLERKS CALENDAR.; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES TERRELL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JAMES THEBEAU PRESENT FOR DEFTS-DEPUTY LUKACS AND COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF INDICATES A DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED AS TO DEFENDANT SUPERVISOR FOR THE; SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT. MATTER IS CONTINUED AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/25/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S33; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MARSHA G SLOUGH, JUDGE; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN 10435; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES TERRELL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY DAVID GUARDADO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COUNSEL REPORTS PARTIES ARE WORKING ON RESOLUTION OF MATTER.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/22/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S33; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOSE A RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • FILE SENT TO S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOSE A RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MARSHA G SLOUGH, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER MICHELE WATSON 10280; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT NOTES THAT NO PROOFS OF SERVICE HAVE BEEN FILED WITH THE COURT AT THIS TIME.; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF ALL PARTIES, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR AN; OSC RE DISMISSAL ON 12/27/11. FAILURE TO APPEAR WILL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS MATTER.; HEARINGS:; VACATE CMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 12/27/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DEPUTY LUKACS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/26/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • FILE SENT TO CP33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 111017-2507 $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110705-3223 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • COMPLAINT/PETITION IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TERRELL, JAMES S