Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 09:04:59 (UTC).

RAMIREZ VS CHO

Case Summary

On 08/05/2010 RAMIREZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0443

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTO RAMIREZ

Defendants

ALEX RENGITO

GRACIE CHO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLINT C ZIDE

1445 Huntington Drive Suite 300

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2010
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN FOR P/U); Minutes; Receipt: 100901-0074 $25.00; 100901-0074-CK Reference Number 001030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GRACIE CHO, ALEX RENGITO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/05/2010 OF ROBERTO RAMIREZ AS TO GRACIE CHO, ALEX RENGITO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/05/2010 OF ROBERTO RAMIREZ ORDERED ENTERED 09/01/10; JUDGMENT FOR: ROBERTO RAMIREZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GRACIE CHO, ALEX RENGITO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GRACIE CHO, ALEX RENGITO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO GRACIE CHO SERVED ON 08/09/10 WITH COSTS OF $105.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ALEX RENGITO SERVED ON 08/09/10 WITH COSTS OF $52.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/05/2010 OF ROBERTO RAMIREZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/09/10 WITH FEES OF $52.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • REQUEST TO SET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANTS HAVE NOT FILED A ANSWER TO THIS CASE..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100806-0464 $235.00; 100806-0464-CK Reference Number 3875/001021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HARRIS & ZIDE - FLINT C. ZIDE