This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 23:24:50 (UTC).

RAMIREZ -V- SILVERSCREEN

Case Summary

On 11/17/2016 RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SILVERSCREEN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9550

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ

Defendant

SILVERSCREEN HEALTHCARE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES LAW GROUP APC

222 N. Selpulveda Blvd Ste 1550

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorney

WALRAVEN & WESTERFELD LLP

20 Enterprise Suite 310

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS W/O PREJUDICE & CLASS CLAIMS W/PREJUDICE FILED

ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS W/O PREJUDICE & CLASS CLAIMS W/PREJUDICE FILED; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL & SUPP DOCS BY MAIL ON 06/08/18 AS TO WALRAVEN & WESTERFELD LLP, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL & SUPP DOCS BY MAIL ON 06/08/18 AS TO WALRAVEN & WESTERFELD LLP, FILED.

PLAS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAS INDIVIDUAL CL AIMS WITH PREJUDICE & CLASS & FILED.

PLAS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAS INDIVIDUAL CL AIMS WITH PREJUDICE & CLASS & FILED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE FILED BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE FILED BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.; Minutes; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S30

ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

JOINT STATUS REPORT * FILED.

JOINT STATUS REPORT * FILED.

JOINT STATUS REPORT FILED.

JOINT STATUS REPORT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SILVERSCREEN HEALTHCARE, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SILVERSCREEN HEALTHCARE, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS W/O PREJUDICE & CLASS CLAIMS W/PREJUDICE FILED; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF FLETCHER W SCHMIDT IN SUPP OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL & SUPP DOCS BY MAIL ON 06/08/18 AS TO WALRAVEN & WESTERFELD LLP, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAS INDIVIDUAL CL AIMS WITH PREJUDICE & CLASS & FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; B. TAM NOMOTO SCHUMANN, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DANIEL BROWN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; BRYAN WESTERFELD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SILVERSCREEN HEALTHCARE, INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF /BY AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL.; THE PARTIES ARE ACTIVELY ENGAGED IN SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS. DEFENSE COUNSEL INTENDS TO BRING; FORTH A MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS THEY CANNOT RESOLVE THE MATTER.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/16/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE FILED BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2016
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.; Minutes; Receipt: 161117-0909 $150.00; 161117-0909-CK Reference Number CK 110746

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161117-0908 $435.00; 161117-0908-CK Reference Number CK 110746

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ESTRELLITA RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less